EP1387122 - Motor vehicle signal lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REAR LAMPS FRANCE Z.I. des Manteaux 89330 Saint-Julien-Du-Sault / FR | [2005/42] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REAR FRANCE Z.I. des Manteaux 89330 Saint-Julien-Du-Sault / FR | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Compagnie d'Equipements Automobiles Axo Scintex 45 rue du Fort-Manoir 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buisson, Alain, Residence les Quatre-Vents 5 rue Ernest et Paul Picard 78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Faber, Jean-Paul CABINET FABER 35, rue de Berne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Faber, Jean-Paul CABINET FABER 35, rue de Berne 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291635.5 | 02.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | FR20020009824 | 01.08.2002 Original published format: FR 0209824 | [2004/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387122 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387122 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/40] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1387122 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/10, F21V9/08, F21V5/00, // F21W101:14 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
F21S43/255 (EP);
F21S43/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/06] | Title | German: | Signalleuchte für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2004/06] | English: | Motor vehicle signal lamp | [2004/06] | French: | Feu de signalisation de véhicule automobile | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 26.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.10.2005 | CY | 05.10.2005 | EE | 05.10.2005 | IE | 05.10.2005 | NL | 05.10.2005 | RO | 05.10.2005 | SK | 05.10.2005 | TR | 05.10.2005 | BG | 05.01.2006 | DK | 05.01.2006 | GR | 05.01.2006 | SE | 05.01.2006 | PT | 06.03.2006 | HU | 06.04.2006 | LU | 02.07.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
EE | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
RO | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
TR | 05.10.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
HU | 06.04.2006 | ||
LU | 02.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
EE | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
RO | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
HU | 06.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
RO | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
HU | 06.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
HU | 06.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | NL | 05.10.2005 | |
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | NL | 05.10.2005 | |
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 05.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2935410 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3130085 (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 8 * * claims 1,3,5 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0697309 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 6, line 18 - line 23 * * claims 1,6 ** figure 5 * |