EP1391821 - A multi processor computing system having a java stack machine and a risc based processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
GB
Texas Instruments Inc. 12500 TI boulevard (M/S 3999) Dallas, TX 75243 / US | For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE Avenue Bel Air, BP 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex Nice / FR | [2014/10] |
Former [2008/24] | For:DE
GB
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 7839 Churchill Way, M/S 3999 Dallas Texas 75251 / US | ||
For:FR
Texas Instruments France Avenue Bel Air BP5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex, Nice / FR | |||
Former [2006/29] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 7839 Churchill Way, M/S 3999 Dallas Texas 75251 / US | ||
For:FR
Texas Instruments France Avenue Bel Air BP5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex, Nice / FR | |||
Former [2004/09] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Texas Instruments Inc. 7839 Churchill Way, M/S 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | ||
For:FR
Texas Instruments France Avenue Bel Air BP5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex, Nice / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'inverno, Dominique 47 Chemin des Basses Ginestières 06270 Villeneuve-Loubet / FR | 02 /
Chauvel, Gerard Résidence du Valbosquet 20 292 du Valbosquet 06600 Antibes / FR | 03 /
Lasserre, Serge 278 rue du Marsaou Lieudit St. Jean de Cannes 83600 Fréjus / FR | 04 /
Kuusela, Maija 320 Chemin de L'Ouvaire 06370 Mouans Sartoux / FR | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas, et al Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK91AQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2004/09] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Ltd., European Patents Dept. MS/13, 800 Pavillion Drive, Northampton Business Park Northampton, Northamptonshire NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03291927.6 | 30.07.2003 | [2004/09] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/09] | US20020400391P | 31.07.2002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1391821 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1391821 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F15/78 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
G06F12/0253 (EP,US);
G06F12/0804 (EP,US);
G06F12/0891 (EP,US);
G06F12/1036 (EP,US);
G06F12/126 (EP,US);
G06F9/30101 (EP,US);
G06F9/30174 (EP,US);
G06F9/3879 (EP,US);
G06F12/0875 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/07] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrfachprozessor-Rechneranordnung mit Java-Stapelgerät und Risc-basierten Prozessor | [2004/09] | English: | A multi processor computing system having a java stack machine and a risc based processor | [2004/09] | French: | Système calculateur multiprocesseur incluant une pile Java et un microprocesseur Risc | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 10.07.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.110(2) in appeal [2019/09] | Appeal following examination | 12.09.2012 | Appeal received No. T0001/13 | 12.11.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.05.2018 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2018/19] | 03.01.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2008 | Request for further processing for: | An appeal is considered to be inadmissible | 12.11.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0230353 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US5226127 (FU BEATRICE P [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US5953741 (EVOY DAVID ROSS [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 64 - column 8, line 29 * * column 13, line 19 - line 37 *; | [A]US2002013872 (YAMADA AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002095562 (NAKANISHI CHIKAKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [PA]US2002184479 (SEXTON BONNIE C [US], et al) [PA] 1-16 * the whole document * |