EP1389026 - Device and method of processing location data for a mobile telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnard, Pierre 6bis, rue Pierre Dupont 92150 Suresnes / FR | 02 /
Nomain, Valérie 2, rue de Reims Appt. 105 75013 Paris / FR | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Hedarchet, Stéphane, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Hedarchet, Stéphane, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/24] | Hedarchet, Stéphane, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/07] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Compagnie Financière Alcatel Département de Propriété Industrielle, 5, rue Noel Pons 92734 Nanterre Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291988.8 | 08.08.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | FR20020010084 | 08.08.2002 Original published format: FR 0210084 | [2004/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1389026 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1389026 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
H04W8/183 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/07] | H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Datenverarbeiten von standortdaten für ein mobiles Telefon | [2010/06] | English: | Device and method of processing location data for a mobile telephone | [2004/07] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de traitement de données de localisation pour un dispositif de téléphone mobile | [2010/06] |
Former [2004/07] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Datenverarbeiten von standortdaten, für mobil Telephon | ||
Former [2004/07] | Dispositif et procédé de traitement de données de localisation, pour un dispositif de téléphone mobile | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 11.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2010 | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | IE | 06.10.2010 | IT | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/10] | SI | 06.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0004730 (SIGNALSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-33* page 7, line 11 - page 15, line 4; figure - *; | [X]EP1119211 (HERTEL JOACHIM [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8,12,17,18,21,24,29 * page 3, line 39 - page 8, line 8; figure - *; | [DY]FR2811192 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [DY] 1,2,5,8,12,17,18,21,24,29 * page 4, line 4 - page 9, line 21; figure . *; | [X]US2002065711 (FUJISAWA TERUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,17 * page 6, paragraph 203 - page 12, paragraph 287; figure - *; | [Y]US2002098832 (FLEISCHER WOLFGANG [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,8,12,17,18,21,24,29 * column 2, paragraph 17 - column 4, paragraph 31; figure - * |