Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
04.01.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.09.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.07.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.03.2005 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
30.03.2005 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
03.12.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
15.10.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |
06.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.03.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |