EP1413485 - Vehicle with one or more tool containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE FRANCAISE DES ASCENSEURS KONE Centre d'Affaires Objectifs 2, 2, rue Louis Armand 92661 Asnieres sue Seine Cedex / FR | [2004/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meunier, Gilles Villa Rihana 8, avenue du Maréchal Juin 06500 Menton / FR | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03292076.1 | 22.08.2003 | [2004/18] | Priority number, date | FR20020011644 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0211644 | [2004/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1413485 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/00, B60R11/06, B60P3/36, B60P3/14 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
B60R11/06 (EP);
B60K28/08 (EP);
B60P3/14 (EP);
B60R11/00 (EP);
B60R2011/0036 (EP);
B60R2011/0082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug mit einem oder mehreren Ordnungselementen | [2004/18] | English: | Vehicle with one or more tool containers | [2004/18] | French: | Véhicule automobile présentant un ou plusieurs éléments de rangement | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 05.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 12.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2530578 (HOTOP NORBERT C) [Y] 4* column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 55; figures 1-5 *; | [XAY]US5498048 (SHELBY JR WILBERT [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 11; figures 1,2 * [A] 6 [Y] 4 |