EP1411191 - Opening device for the hood of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles SA Route de Gizy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouriot, Franck 42bis, rue du Viette 25400 Audincourt / FR | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Seytre, Françoise PSA Peugeot Citroen, Département Propriété Industrielle (081), 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Seytre, Françoise PSA Peugeot Citroen, Département Propriété Industrielle (081), 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 03292485.4 | 08.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | FR20020012991 | 18.10.2002 Original published format: FR 0212991 | [2004/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1411191 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1411191 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05B13/00 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
E05B13/005 (EP);
E05B79/20 (EP);
E05B83/24 (EP);
E05B85/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/17] | Title | German: | Öffnungsvorrichtung für Fahrzeugmotorhaube | [2004/17] | English: | Opening device for the hood of a motor vehicle | [2004/17] | French: | Dispositif d'ouverture d'un capot de véhicule automobile | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2006 | CY | 20.12.2006 | CZ | 20.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | EE | 20.12.2006 | FI | 20.12.2006 | IE | 20.12.2006 | NL | 20.12.2006 | RO | 20.12.2006 | SI | 20.12.2006 | SK | 20.12.2006 | TR | 20.12.2006 | BG | 20.03.2007 | SE | 20.03.2007 | GR | 21.03.2007 | PT | 24.04.2007 | HU | 21.06.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CY | 20.12.2006 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
EE | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
EE | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 20.12.2006 | |
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5535608 (BRIN CONSTANTIN [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,7-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2766225 (VALEO SYSTEMES DE FERMETURES [FR]) [A] 1,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29819556U (RIEDL HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1,7,8* the whole document * |