12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
15.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
04.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
02.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
14.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
31.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
02.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
23.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
12.01.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
10.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
27.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
13.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
06.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
22.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
01.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
04.08.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
20.01.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
22.12.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.12.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
27.04.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
31.12.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] |
10.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
09.04.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |