EP1422790 - Coaxial connector, in particular standardized 7/16 connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Ohm 211, rue d'Herblay 95150 Taverny / FR | [2004/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taton, Michel 65, rue Raspail 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al SEP Pagenberg & Associés 14 boulevard Malesherbes 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03292861.6 | 19.11.2003 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | FR20020014628 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: FR 0214628 | [2004/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422790 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422790 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/646, H01R9/05 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
H01R24/44 (EP);
H01R9/0503 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/22] | Title | German: | Koaxialverbinder, insbesondere 7/16 genormter Verbinder | [2004/22] | English: | Coaxial connector, in particular standardized 7/16 connector | [2004/22] | French: | Connecteur coaxial, notamment connecteur normalisé 7/16 | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 01.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | CZ | 08.03.2006 | EE | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | GB | 08.03.2006 | IE | 08.03.2006 | IT | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | RO | 08.03.2006 | SI | 08.03.2006 | SK | 08.03.2006 | TR | 08.03.2006 | BG | 08.06.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | DE | 09.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | ES | 19.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | HU | 09.09.2006 | LU | 19.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | FR | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
TR | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
DE | 09.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
HU | 09.09.2006 | ||
LU | 19.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
FR | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
DE | 09.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
HU | 09.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
FR | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
DE | 09.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
FR | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
DE | 09.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
FR | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
DE | 09.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
DE | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
DE | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
DE | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
DE | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
GB | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3678447 (ZIEGLER GEORGE WILLIAM JR, et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 17 - line 18 *; | [A]US4834676 (TACKETT CRAIG A [US]) [A] 1-7* column 5, line 47 - line 56 *; | [A]DE19850394 (SIHN JR KG WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |