EP1422346 - Device for spreading liquid binder and aggregate from the back of a road working apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Famaro 17, rue Timbaud 42420 Lorette / FR | [2004/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marconnet, Guy Chemin de Gitoux 42800 Saint Martin La Plaine / FR | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03292876.4 | 19.11.2003 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | FR20020014760 | 25.11.2002 Original published format: FR 0214760 | FR20030009616 | 04.08.2003 Original published format: FR 0309616 | [2004/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422346 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422346 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/21, E01C19/17 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
E01C19/21 (EP,US);
E01C19/176 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Spritzen von Bindemittel und Streuen von Aggregat am Heck einer Strassenbearbeitungsvorrichtung | [2004/22] | English: | Device for spreading liquid binder and aggregate from the back of a road working apparatus | [2004/22] | French: | Dispositif d'épandage de liant liquide et de gravillons à l'arrière d'un engin de travaux routiers | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 12.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2008 | CY | 23.04.2008 | CZ | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | EE | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | IE | 23.04.2008 | IT | 23.04.2008 | NL | 23.04.2008 | RO | 23.04.2008 | SI | 23.04.2008 | SK | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | BG | 23.07.2008 | SE | 23.07.2008 | DE | 24.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | ES | 03.08.2008 | PT | 23.09.2008 | HU | 24.10.2008 | GB | 19.11.2008 | LU | 19.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | FR | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2011/45] |
Former [2010/48] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
TR | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
GR | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
GB | 19.11.2008 | ||
LU | 19.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
TR | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
GB | 19.11.2008 | ||
LU | 19.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
GB | 19.11.2008 | ||
LU | 19.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
GB | 19.11.2008 | ||
LU | 19.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
GB | 19.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 23.04.2008 | |
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 23.04.2008 | |
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 23.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2102865 (PEDERSEN AS MARIUS [DK]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4403243 (BREINING ROBERT MASCH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2800758 (CMTP SARL [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2817568 (C M T P [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |