EP1331354 - Belt actuated roller shutter with anti-lifting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moulages Plastiques du Midi 10, boulevard de Joffrery 31600 Muret / FR | [2003/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albignac, Michel 21, rue Louise Michel 31600 Seysses / FR | 02 /
Dambielle, Jean-Michel 15, rue du Pastel 31130 Pin Balma / FR | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/31] | Morelle, Guy Cabinet Morelle & Bardou, Parc Technologique du Canal, 9 Avenue de l'Europe, BP 53 31527 Ramonville Saint Agne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03352002.4 | 28.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | FR20020001031 | 29.01.2002 Original published format: FR 0201031 | [2003/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331354 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/84, E06B9/78, E06B9/90 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
E06B9/78 (EP);
E06B9/86 (EP);
E06B2009/785 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/31] | Title | German: | Rolladen mit Gurtbetätigung und Vorrichting gegen das Hochschieben | [2003/31] | English: | Belt actuated roller shutter with anti-lifting device | [2003/31] | French: | Volet roulant à manoeuvre par sangle avec dispositif anti-relevage | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7242333U (EIZENHÖFER) [A] 1,2 * page 7, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH08121061 ; | [A]WO8502439 (WISSMANN JEAN [LU], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE1977979U (JACHMANN ERICH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08121061 A 19960514 (JIYATSUKU:KK) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |