EP1335277 - Efficient saturating operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2003/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupont de Dinechin, Benoît 5, Rue Gabriel Péri 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 03354010.5 | 06.02.2003 | [2003/33] | Priority number, date | FR20020001569 | 08.02.2002 Original published format: FR 0201569 | [2003/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335277 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335277 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/499, G06F7/50, G06F7/509, // G06F7/544 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
G06F7/509 (EP,US);
G06F7/5443 (EP,US);
G06F7/49921 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/33] | G06F7/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/19] |
Former [2003/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Effiziente sättigende Operation | [2003/33] | English: | Efficient saturating operation | [2003/33] | French: | Opérateur saturant à haute efficacité | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.08.2009 | FR | 01.03.2010 | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/07] | FR | 01.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5889689 (ALIDINA MAZHAR M [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]US6182105 (KOLAGOTLA RAVI KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1,6* abstract * |