EP1383150 - Switch with a trip device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auque, Henri, Schneider Electric Industries SAS Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
Serpinet, Marc, Schneider Electric Industries SAS Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Propriété Industrielle - E1 38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Propriété Industrielle - E1 38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/04] | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge (FR), et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Service Propriété Industrielle-A7 F-38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03354049.3 | 02.06.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | FR20020009054 | 17.07.2002 Original published format: FR 0209054 | [2004/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1383150 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1383150 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/52 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
H01H71/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, PT [2004/42] |
Former [2004/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schalter mit Auslöseeinrichtung | [2004/04] | English: | Switch with a trip device | [2004/04] | French: | Interrupteur muni d'un dispositif de declenchement | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 01.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.06.2011 | PT | 05.09.2011 | [2012/17] |
Former [2011/47] | PT | 05.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19507605 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * |