EP1471499 - Method of distributed speech synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/40] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sienel, Jürgen Alte Dorfstrasse 5 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Kopp, Dieter Brandstrasse 1 75428 Illingen / DE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte GbR, Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03360052.9 | 25.04.2003 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471499 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471499 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/04 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
G10L13/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Methode zur Sprachsynthese für verteilte Systeme | [2004/44] | English: | Method of distributed speech synthesis | [2004/44] | French: | Procédé de la synthèse de parole répartie | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2014 | 07.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2003 | AT | 01.10.2014 | BE | 01.10.2014 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | CZ | 01.10.2014 | DK | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | ES | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | IT | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | NL | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | SE | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | TR | 01.10.2014 | GR | 02.01.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | IE | 25.04.2015 | LU | 25.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.04.2003 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | NL | 01.10.2014 | |
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 01.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5802100 (PINE MARMON [US], et al); | [X]US6275793 (TAVERNESE PETER [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2002184031 (BRITTAN PAUL ST JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 7 * paragraph [0064] *; | [A]US6516207 (GUPTA VISHWA N [CA], et al); | [A]US2003061051 (KONDO REISHI [JP], et al) | Examination | US2002103646 |