EP1391346 - Roadwork vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CFM Nilfisk-Advance via Turati 16/18 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states CFM Nilfisk-Advance S.p.A via Turati 16/18 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Jungo, Nicolas Kohlgraben 8 6370 Stans / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jungo, Nicolas Kohlgraben 8 6370 Stans / CH | [2006/04] |
Former [2004/09] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Burkard, Thierry 40 rue de Stalingrad 68100 Mulhouse / FR | [2004/09] | Application number, filing date | 03360075.0 | 23.06.2003 | [2004/09] | Priority number, date | FR20020009585 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: FR 0209585 | [2004/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391346 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/30 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
B60P3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [2004/47] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Arbeitsfahrzeuge | [2004/09] | English: | Roadwork vehicle | [2004/09] | French: | Véhicule de voirie | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 26.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 06.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/30] | 16.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.10.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2006 | 30.06.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0962380 (INT STIFTUNG FUER TECH KNOW HO [LI]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 14 - line 17; figure - *; | [A]DE19953786 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1* column A; figures 1,5 * |