EP1538058 - Method and system of compensating variations in the voltage in the sending coil of a rail contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2005/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klose, Bernd Gartenstr. 21/6 71679 Asperg / DE | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2005/23] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03360134.5 | 01.12.2003 | [2005/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1538058 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B61L1/16 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
B61L1/20 (EP);
B61L1/167 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Ausgleich von Spannungsschwankungen einer Sendespule eines Schienenkontakts | [2005/23] | English: | Method and system of compensating variations in the voltage in the sending coil of a rail contact | [2005/23] | French: | Méthode et système de compensation de voltage dans une bobine émettrice d'une contact placé sur la voie | [2005/23] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 22.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/37] | 09.12.2005 | Date of oral proceedings |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1130194 (CIE GENERALE D ELECTRONIQUE IN) [A] 1-7* page 2, line 5 - page 2, line 97; figure 1 *; | [X]DE2929291 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3302883 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 32; figure 1 * |