|
15.03.2012 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |