Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1430761 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2012 | B2 | EP1430761 | 03.05.2006 | B1 | EP1430761 | 23.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0216046 | 16.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE324775T | 15.06.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0216046 | 16.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60304979T | 21.12.2006 | T2 | DE60304979D1 | 08.06.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0216046 | 16.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1430761T | 11.09.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0216046 | 16.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2848381 | 12.08.2005 | B1 | FR2848381 | 18.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0216046 | 16.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20035584L | 17.06.2004 | L | NO20035584D0 | 15.12.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | FR0216046 | 16.12.2002 |