Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | BE | Lapse: 31.12.2006 | BG | Lapse: 03.08.2006 | CH | Lapse: 31.12.2007 | CY | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | CZ | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | DE | | DK | | EE | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | ES | Lapse: 14.08.2006 | FI | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 04.08.2006 | HU | Lapse: 04.11.2006 | IE | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | IT | | LI | Lapse: 31.12.2007 | LU | Lapse: 08.12.2006 | MC | Lapse: 31.12.2006 | NL | | PT | Lapse: 03.10.2006 | RO | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | SE | Lapse: 03.08.2006 | SI | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | SK | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | TR | Lapse: 03.05.2006 | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | European patent granted | 03.05.2006 | Opposition procedure | 27.02.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 23.06.2004 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 23.06.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Event date: | 23.02.2005 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20041223 | | Event date: | 16.03.2005 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 11.05.2005 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20050323 | | Event date: | 03.05.2006 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 03.05.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Event date: | 15.05.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 08.06.2006 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60304979 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20060608 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 14.06.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH | | Event date: | 23.08.2006 | | Event description: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 20060731 | | Event date: | 11.09.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 29.12.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FD4D | Code Expl.: | -EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID | | Event date: | 21.02.2007 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | KUHN S.A. | | Event date: | 07.03.2007 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | AMAZONEN-WERKE H. DREYER GMBH & CO. KG | Effective DATE: | 20070131 | | Event date: | 01.05.2007 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | AMAZONEN-WERKE H. DREYER GMBH & CO. KG | | Event date: | 01.05.2007 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN | OWNER: | KUHN S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20070221 | | Event date: | 01.08.2007 | | Event description: | NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS | OWNER: | KUHN S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20070522 | | Event date: | 03.10.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20061003 | | Event date: | 31.12.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20061231 | | Event date: | 03.05.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 14.08.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060814 | | Event date: | 03.05.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 03.05.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 31.12.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20061231 | | Event date: | 03.05.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 03.08.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060803 | | Event date: | 03.05.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 03.05.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 30.04.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060804 | | Event date: | 30.06.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 30.06.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060803 | | Event date: | 31.07.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20061104 | | Event date: | 31.07.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20061208 | | Event date: | 31.07.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 31.07.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 31.12.2007 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | KUHN-NODET S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20061231 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20071231 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20071231 | | Event date: | 28.11.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 04.09.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Event date: | 17.11.2010 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | AMAZONEN-WERKE H. DREYER GMBH & CO. KG | Effective DATE: | 20070131 | | Event date: | 31.01.2011 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20101125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 31.03.2011 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20101127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 31.03.2011 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20101201 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20101208 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 31.01.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20111122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.01.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20111128 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 11.04.2012 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Effective DATE: | 20120411 | | Event date: | 11.04.2012 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 01.08.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL VDEP | Code Expl.: | -DISCONTINUED IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20120411 | | Event date: | 31.10.2012 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120712 | | Event date: | 31.01.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120711 | | Event date: | 31.01.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120411 | | Event date: | 28.08.2013 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20121208 | | Event date: | 15.09.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK05 324775 AT T | Code Expl.: | -DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT) | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 29.11.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20121208 | | Event date: | 31.12.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20121208 | | Event date: | 31.05.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R102 60304979 DE | Code Expl.: | EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL | Effective DATE: | 20120411 | | Event date: | 12.07.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R135 60304979 DE | Code Expl.: | -EUROPEAN PATENT DEEMED VOID AB INITIO FOR DE | | Event date: | 23.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 29.07.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 20060503 | | Event date: | 21.11.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 21.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.01.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20171121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20181231 | | Event date: | 09.03.2012 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009272 | | Event date: | 17.03.2006 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 25.02.2006 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 10.11.2005 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 07.05.2004 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 09.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT MAINTAINED AS AMENDED | | Event date: | 15.10.2010 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 17.07.2007 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 15.03.2007 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 14.03.2007 | | Event description: | EXAMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF OPPOSITION: INFORMATION RELATED TO DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION + TIME LIMIT DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDOPE2 | | Event date: | 14.03.2007 | | Event description: | EXAMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF OPPOSITION: INFORMATION RELATED TO RECEIPT OF REPLY DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDOPE4 | | Event date: | 14.03.2007 | | Event description: | EXAMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF OPPOSITION: REPLY RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOPE4 | | Event date: | 21.02.2007 | | Event description: | EXAMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF OPPOSITION: DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION + TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOPE2 | | Event date: | 02.02.2007 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |