EP1407766 - Pharmaceutical compositions that contain a salt of alendronic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verisfield (UK) Ltd. Kerassountos Street 14 115 28 Athens / GR | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Verisfield (UK) Ltd. 120 East Road London, N1 6AA / GB | ||
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Verisfield (UK) Ltd. 120 East Road London, N1 6AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pantazopoulou, Myrsini 57 C Syrou Athens / GR | [2004/16] | Application number, filing date | 03386023.0 | 03.10.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | GR20020100436 | 07.10.2002 Original published format: GR 2002100436 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1407766 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1407766 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1407766 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K9/00, A61K31/663 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/663 (EP);
A61K9/1623 (EP);
A61K9/1652 (EP);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61K9/2059 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/16] | A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K31/663 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | 07.10.2004 | LT | 07.10.2004 | LV | 07.10.2004 | MK | 07.10.2004 | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen mit einem Salz von Alendronsäure | [2004/16] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions that contain a salt of alendronic acid | [2004/16] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques contenant un sel d'acide alendronique | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.07.2009 | BE | 01.07.2009 | CY | 01.07.2009 | CZ | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | EE | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | IT | 01.07.2009 | NL | 01.07.2009 | RO | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | SI | 01.07.2009 | SK | 01.07.2009 | TR | 01.07.2009 | BG | 01.10.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | GB | 03.10.2009 | IE | 03.10.2009 | LU | 03.10.2009 | ES | 12.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | HU | 02.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
GB | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 03.10.2009 | ||
LU | 03.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
GB | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 03.10.2009 | ||
LU | 03.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
GB | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 03.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
GB | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 03.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
IE | 03.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | SI | 01.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5462932 (BRENNER GERALD S [US], et al) [A] 1-10* claim - *; | [A]WO0185176 (INST FARMACEUTYCZNY [PL], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim - * * example - * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 3 *; | [A]WO0203963 (LECIVA A S [CZ], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim - * * examples 2-5,7 * * page 15; table TABLE * * page 18, paragraph B * * page 19; table TABLE * * page 12, line 5 - line 13 * * page 13, line 3 - line 10 * |