Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1407766 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2009 | B1 | EP1407766 | 28.04.2004 | A3 | EP1407766 | 14.04.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GR20020100436 | 07.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR1004331 | 05.09.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | GR20020100436 | 07.10.2002 |