EP1327422 - Stent delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic AVE, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa California 95403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Medtronic AVE, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallagher, Brendan P. Medtronic Ave., Parkmore Industrial Estate Galway / IE | 02 /
Rogers, Ronan Medtronic Ave., Parkmore Industrial Estate Galway / IE | 03 /
Gribbons, Richard Medtronic Ave., Parkmore Industrial Estate Galway / IE | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | McKeown, Yvonne Mary MacLachlan & Donaldson 2B Clonskeagh Square Clonskeagh Road Dublin 14 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | McKeown, Yvonne Mary c/o MacLachlan & Donaldson, 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03394003.2 | 07.01.2003 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | US20020050651 | 14.01.2002 Original published format: US 50651 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327422 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
A61F2/958 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0018 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0098 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/29] | Title | German: | Stentanbringungssystem | [2003/29] | English: | Stent delivery system | [2003/29] | French: | Système de mise en place d'un stent | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/07] | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9810713 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 27, line 24 - page 32, line 26 *; | [A]US5735859 (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-9* column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 15 *; | [X]EP0941716 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0025] *; | [X]US5976153 (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 4, line 20 - column 7, line 33 *; | [A]US6042588 (MUNSINGER JOEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 30 - column 8, line 58 *; | [X]WO0134240 (ENDOVASCULAR TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 21, line 15 - page 23, line 11 * * figures 6A,7 * | by applicant | WO9612517 | WO9807390 | US5776161 | EP1000591 | EP1000592 | EP1000593 |