EP1346635 - Spinning reel rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Shimano Inc. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwabuchi, Masakazu, c/o Shimano Inc. 77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 02 /
Kitajima, Keigo, c/o Shimano Inc. 77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Purdy, Hugh Barry Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glagow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Purdy, Hugh Barry Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glagow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2003/39] | Purdy, Hugh Barry Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03394014.9 | 12.02.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | JP20020074202 | 18.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002074202 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346635 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346635 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K89/01 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
A01K89/01 (EP,US);
A01K89/015 (KR);
A01K89/0108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | Rotor für Angelwinde | [2003/39] | English: | Spinning reel rotor | [2003/39] | French: | Rotor pour moulinet de pêche | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 01.09.2004 | CH | 01.09.2004 | CZ | 01.09.2004 | EE | 01.09.2004 | FI | 01.09.2004 | LI | 01.09.2004 | SI | 01.09.2004 | SK | 01.09.2004 | TR | 01.09.2004 | DK | 01.12.2004 | GR | 01.12.2004 | SE | 01.12.2004 | HU | 02.12.2004 | PT | 01.02.2005 | CY | 12.02.2005 | LU | 12.02.2005 | IE | 14.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2008/22] |
Former [2008/04] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
EE | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
HU | 02.12.2004 | ||
PT | 01.02.2005 | ||
CY | 12.02.2005 | ||
IT | 12.02.2005 | ||
LU | 12.02.2005 | ||
IE | 14.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/34] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
EE | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
HU | 02.12.2004 | ||
CY | 12.02.2005 | ||
IT | 12.02.2005 | ||
LU | 12.02.2005 | ||
IE | 14.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
EE | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
HU | 02.12.2004 | ||
CY | 12.02.2005 | ||
LU | 12.02.2005 | ||
IE | 14.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
EE | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
HU | 02.12.2004 | ||
LU | 12.02.2005 | ||
IE | 14.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
HU | 02.12.2004 | ||
IE | 14.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
HU | 02.12.2004 | ||
IE | 14.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
IE | 14.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | CH | 01.09.2004 | |
CZ | 01.09.2004 | ||
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SK | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | CH | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 01.09.2004 | |
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 01.09.2004 | |
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 01.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001136874 ; | [A]JP2000279065 ; | [A]US5605298 (SHIMOZAKI TETSUYA [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 35; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001136874 A 20010522 (SHIMANO INC) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000279065 A 20001010 (SHIMANO INC) [A] 1 * abstract * |