EP1475544 - Multiple elongated tubular elements connection joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fernandes, Joaquim Antonio Rua Estrada do Picheleiro, Barosa 2400-13 Leiria / PT | [2004/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernandes, Joaquim Antonio Rua Estrada do Picheleiro, Barosa 2400-13 Leira / PT | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Pereira da Cruz, Joao J. Pereira da Cruz, S.A. Rua Victor Cordon, 14 1249-103 Lisboa / PT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Pereira da Cruz, Joao J. Pereira da Cruz, S.A. Rua Victor Cordon, 14 1249-103 Lisboa / PT | Application number, filing date | 03398003.8 | 09.05.2003 | [2004/46] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475544 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04, F16B7/18 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
F16B7/185 (EP);
F16B7/0413 (EP);
F16B7/0453 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | Gelenkverbindung zwischen verschiedene rohrartige langgestreckte Elemente | [2004/46] | English: | Multiple elongated tubular elements connection joint | [2004/46] | French: | Joint de connexion entre multiples éléments tubulaires allongés | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/17] | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR846974 (CAMINATI CARLO) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2212455 (REED FRANK S) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US3864051 (REID ROBERT) [A] 1-9* figures 2-17 *; | [A]EP0008555 (DES ETABLISSEMENTS POURTEAU SO [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US2002017062 (MORRIS CHARLES H [CA]) [X] 1 * figures 2-18 * [A] 2-9 |