EP1440737 - Dispensing applicator for at least two components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mixpac Systems AG Grundstrasse 12 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [2004/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Wilhelm A. Obstgartenweg 9 6402 Merlischachen / CH | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Seehof, Michel Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Seehof, Michel Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [2004/31] | Seehof, Michel c/o AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 03405027.8 | 24.01.2003 | [2004/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440737 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/005, B65D81/32 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
B05C17/00509 (EP);
B05C17/00516 (EP);
B05C17/00553 (EP);
B29B7/325 (EP);
B65D81/325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | Austraganordnung mit einem Austraggerät für mindestens zwei Komponenten | [2004/31] | English: | Dispensing applicator for at least two components | [2004/31] | French: | Appareil distributeur pour au moins deux composants | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 03.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/45] | 27.06.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4949873 (MAEDER AUGUST [CH]) [A] 4* column 3, line 42 - line 60; figures 3-7 *; | [X]US6161730 (HEUSSER ROLF [CH], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 9; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US6186363 (KELLER WILHELM A [CH], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 13, line 53 - column 14, line 60; figures 48,50-56 * |