EP1378713 - Fastening means for radiators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konsolen AG Hauptstrasse 30 4417 Ziefen / CH | [2004/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Artz, Gilbert Kirchhaldenweg 32 4434 Hölstein / CH | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Eder, Carl E. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Eder, Carl E. Patentanwaltsbüro EDER AG Basel Lindenhofstrasse 40 4052 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2004/02] | Schwander, Kuno Patentanwaltsbüro Eder AG Lindenhofstrasse 40 4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 03405117.7 | 24.02.2003 | [2004/02] | Priority number, date | CH19850200210 | 24.06.2002 Original published format: CH 20021085 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1378713 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1378713 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1378713 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/02 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
F24D19/0259 (EP);
F24D19/02 (EP);
F24D19/0209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | Befestigungsmittel für Heizungskörper | [2004/02] | English: | Fastening means for radiators | [2004/02] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour radiateurs | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.07.2006 | CZ | 19.07.2006 | EE | 19.07.2006 | FI | 19.07.2006 | IE | 19.07.2006 | IT | 19.07.2006 | NL | 19.07.2006 | SI | 19.07.2006 | SK | 19.07.2006 | TR | 19.07.2006 | BG | 19.10.2006 | DK | 19.10.2006 | SE | 19.10.2006 | GR | 20.10.2006 | ES | 30.10.2006 | PT | 19.12.2006 | HU | 20.01.2007 | AT | 24.02.2007 | GB | 24.02.2007 | LU | 24.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | FR | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
AT | 24.02.2007 | ||
GB | 24.02.2007 | ||
LU | 24.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
AT | 24.02.2007 | ||
GB | 24.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
AT | 24.02.2007 | ||
GB | 24.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
GB | 24.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
GB | 24.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 19.07.2006 | |
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 19.07.2006 | |
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 19.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL7310171 (IDEAL STANDARD HOLLAND B V) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE29902238U (WEMEFA HORST CHRISTOPEIT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* figure - * |