EP1342789 - Cantilever apparatus and method for detecting microorganisms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concentris GmbH Davidsbodenstrasse 63 4012 Basel / CH | For all designated states Universität Basel Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | [2005/44] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Concentris GmbH Davidsbodenstrasse 63 4012 Basel / CH | ||
For all designated states Universität Basel Petersgraben 35 4003 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Concentris GmbH Davidsbodenstrasse 63 4012 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hubler, Urs Christian Colmarerstrasse 50 4055 Basel / CH | 02 /
Battiston, Felice Mauro Gründenstrasse 60 4132 Muttenz / CH | 03 /
Hermann, Bianca Antje Gotthelfstrasse 97 4054 Basel / CH | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Barth, Carl Otto ABACUS Patentanwälte Klocke Späth Barth Zürichstrasse 34 8134 Adliswil/Zürich / CH | [2009/30] |
Former [2003/37] | Barth, Carl Otto ABACUS Patentanwälte Klocke Späth Barth Zürichstrasse 34 8134 Adliswil/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03405136.7 | 28.02.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | DE2002109245 | 04.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10209245 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1342789 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1342789 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1342789 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/02, G01B7/34, G01N21/00, G01N27/00 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
G01N29/036 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/02 (EP,US);
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0257 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/37] | C12Q1/02, G01B7/34, G01N27/00, G01N21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/37] | Title | German: | Ausleger-Gerät und Verfahren zum Nachweis von Mikroorganismen | [2003/37] | English: | Cantilever apparatus and method for detecting microorganisms | [2003/37] | French: | Appareil en porte-à-faux et procédé pour la détection des microorganismes | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 11.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2005 | BE | 02.11.2005 | CY | 02.11.2005 | CZ | 02.11.2005 | EE | 02.11.2005 | FI | 02.11.2005 | IT | 02.11.2005 | NL | 02.11.2005 | SI | 02.11.2005 | SK | 02.11.2005 | TR | 02.11.2005 | DK | 02.02.2006 | GR | 02.02.2006 | SE | 02.02.2006 | ES | 13.02.2006 | BG | 28.02.2006 | IE | 28.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | PT | 03.04.2006 | HU | 03.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
EE | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
IT | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
TR | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
IE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
EE | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
IT | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
IE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
IT | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
IE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
IE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
HU | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
IE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SI | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
CZ | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SK | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5135852 (EBERSOLE RICHARD C [US], et al) [DA] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 5 *; | [DA]WO0058729 (LOCKHEED MARTIN ENERGY RES COR [US]) [DA] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 27 *; | [DA] - TURNER R. AND REICHL U., "Silicon micromachining technology for sub-nanogram discrete mass resonant biosensors", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF PHYS., (19920807), vol. 70, pages 1178 - 1183, XP008024852 [DA] 1-20 * the whole document * | [DA] - ILIC B., ET AL, "Single cell detection with micromechanical oscillators", J. VAC. SCI. TECHNOL. B., (20011101), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 2825 - 2828, XP002262274 [DA] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.1421572 |