EP1462485 - Polymerizable dichroic azo dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolic AG Chamerstrasse 50 6301 Zug / CH | [2004/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peglow, Thomas Feldbergstrasse 8 79539 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
Cherkaoui, Zoubair M. Allmendstrasse 2 4123 Allschwil / CH | 03 /
Moia, Franco Eggstrasse 24A 4402 Frenkendorf / CH | 04 /
Schwab, Mario Jägerstrasse 8 79108 Freiburg / DE | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Bremi, Tobias, Dr., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03405207.6 | 26.03.2003 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462485 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09B69/10 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
C09B69/106 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US);
C09K2323/02 (EP,US);
C09K2323/031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polymerisierbare dichroitische Azofarbstoffe | [2004/40] | English: | Polymerizable dichroic azo dyes | [2004/40] | French: | Colorants azo dichroiques polymerisables | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/01] | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.05.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60184564 ; | [A]JPS61221267 ; | [A]JPS60262858 ; | [X]EP1209515 (UNIV HONG KONG SCIENCE & TECHN [HK], et al) [X] 1-54 * examples 1,2,6 *; | [X]EP1256602 (ROLIC AG [CH]) [X] 1-54 * example R1; claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860206), vol. 010, no. 031, Database accession no. (C - 327), & JP60184564 A 19850920 (MITSUI TOATSU KAGAKU KK) [X] 1-54 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870226), vol. 011, no. 063, Database accession no. (C - 406), & JP61221267 A 19861001 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [A] 1-54 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860522), vol. 010, no. 139, Database accession no. (C - 348), & JP60262858 A 19851226 (MITSUI TOATSU KAGAKU KK) [A] 1-54 * abstract * |