EP1466853 - Method for the maintenance of an elevator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liebetrau, Christoph Myrtenstrasse 19 5737 Menziken / CH | 02 /
Rotboll, Esben Kolinplatz 7 6300 Zug / CH | [2004/42] | Application number, filing date | 03405232.4 | 07.04.2003 | [2004/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466853 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
B66B5/0087 (EP);
B66B5/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/27] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wartung eines Aufzuges | [2004/42] | English: | Method for the maintenance of an elevator | [2004/42] | French: | Méthode pour l' entretien d'un ascenseur | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/10] | 29.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.05.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH0656362 ; | [YA]JPH02225278 ; | [A]JP2000355471 ; | [A]NL9100059 (OTIS LIFTEN B V) [A] 6,7 * abstract * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940606), vol. 018, no. 294, Database accession no. (M - 1616), & JP06056362 A 19940301 (MITSUBISHI DENKI BILL TECHNO SERVICE KK) [X] 1,2,4,8 * abstract * [A] 3 [Y] 5 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901127), vol. 014, no. 536, Database accession no. (M - 1052), & JP02225278 A 19900907 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 5 * abstract * [A] 1 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000355471 A 20001226 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 10,11 * abstract * |