EP1535677 - Press tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBERIT TECHNIK AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2005/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allemann, Rudolf Kirchhaldenstrasse 22a 8722 Kaltbrunn / CH | 02 /
Oengören, Abdullah Flurhofstrasse 13 8370 Sirnach / CH | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03405848.7 | 27.11.2003 | [2005/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535677 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535677 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/04, B25B27/10 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
B25B27/10 (EP);
B21D39/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Title | German: | Presswerkzeug | [2005/22] | English: | Press tool | [2005/22] | French: | Outil de sertissage | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.09.2007 | CZ | 12.09.2007 | DK | 12.09.2007 | EE | 12.09.2007 | FI | 12.09.2007 | GB | 12.09.2007 | IE | 12.09.2007 | NL | 12.09.2007 | RO | 12.09.2007 | SI | 12.09.2007 | SK | 12.09.2007 | TR | 12.09.2007 | LU | 27.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | FR | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | BG | 12.12.2007 | SE | 12.12.2007 | GR | 13.12.2007 | ES | 23.12.2007 | PT | 12.02.2008 | HU | 13.03.2008 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 12.09.2007 | |
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
LU | 27.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 12.09.2007 | |
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CZ | 12.09.2007 | |
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GB | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 12.09.2007 | |
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 12.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6044681 (FRENKEN EGBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 38; figures 10,11 *; | [AD]EP1036608 (GEBERIT TECHNIK AG [CH]) [AD] 1-4 * figures 1-6 *; | [AD]EP1208949 (KLAUKE GMBH GUSTAV [DE]) [AD] 1-4* figures 1-14 * |