EP1431217 - Device for supporting a roll and device and method for removing a roll from its axle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIFAG Maschinenfabrik AG Wylerringstrasse 39 3014 Bern / CH | [2007/36] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Wifag Wylerringstrasse 39 3001 Bern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furrer, Hans Auweg 10c 3628 Uttigen / CH | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03405869.3 | 05.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | DE20021057898 | 11.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10257898 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431217 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431217 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12, B65H19/30 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B65H19/126 (EP,US);
B65H19/12 (EP,US);
B65H19/30 (EP,US);
Y10S414/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Tragen einer Rolle und Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ausachsen einer Rolle | [2004/26] | English: | Device for supporting a roll and device and method for removing a roll from its axle | [2004/26] | French: | Appareil de support d'un rouleau et appareil et procédé pour déplacer un rouleau par rapport à son axe | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 28.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | CZ | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | RO | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | AT | 05.12.2007 | IE | 05.12.2007 | LU | 05.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | BG | 14.02.2008 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | ES | 25.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | HU | 15.05.2008 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
AT | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
LU | 05.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
AT | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
AT | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5402980 (GRAY WARREN R [US], et al) [A] 1,7,12* column 2, line 19 - line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29908233U (WESTFALIA WST SYSTEMTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,7-9,12 * page 5, paragraph 7 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 4; figure 3 *; | [A]DE10020909 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,7,12 * column 5, line 32 - line 47; figure 2 * |