EP1552860 - Foam fire extinguishing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: PT | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciocca, Claude 2, Avenue des Alpes 1006 Lausanne / CH | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Bovard SA Neuchâtel Rue des Noyers 11 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | GLN Rue du Puits-Godet 8a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2005/28] | Gresset, Jean GLN Gresset & Laesser Neuchâtel Puits-Godet 8A 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 03405902.2 | 17.12.2003 | [2005/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552860 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552860 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A62C31/12 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
A62C5/02 (EP);
A62C31/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Title | German: | Schaum-Feuerlöschsystem | [2005/28] | English: | Foam fire extinguishing system | [2005/28] | French: | Système d'extinction de feu à mousse | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 19.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | IE | 18.11.2009 | NL | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | LU | 17.12.2009 | GR | 19.02.2010 | MC | 01.07.2010 | [2014/37] |
Former [2011/21] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LU | 17.12.2009 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3592269 (STULTS HOWARD C) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19539991 (PREUSSAG AG MINIMAX [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]US5785126 (OLSSON OVE [SE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO03041806 |