EP1474968 - Cellular structure universally directed for holding anti-parasite products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spadavecchia, Pietro via Ferrerie n. 124 84081 Baronissi (SA) / IT | [2004/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Turini, Laura Studio Legale Turini Via Lamarmora 55 50121 Florence (FI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Turini, Laura P.za S. Giovanni, 8 56038 Ponsacco (PI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 03425174.4 | 19.03.2003 | [2004/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1474968 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1474968 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01G13/00 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
A01G13/0231 (EP);
A01G13/0206 (EP);
A01G13/0275 (EP);
A01G9/1438 (EP);
Y02A40/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | Zellstruktur universalerweise gerichtet zum Halten von antiparasitären Substanzen | [2004/46] | English: | Cellular structure universally directed for holding anti-parasite products | [2004/46] | French: | Structure cellulaire universellement dirigée pour soutenir des substances anti-parasites | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 19.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2005 | BE | 24.08.2005 | CH | 24.08.2005 | CY | 24.08.2005 | CZ | 24.08.2005 | EE | 24.08.2005 | FI | 24.08.2005 | LI | 24.08.2005 | NL | 24.08.2005 | RO | 24.08.2005 | SI | 24.08.2005 | SK | 24.08.2005 | TR | 24.08.2005 | BG | 24.11.2005 | DK | 24.11.2005 | GR | 24.11.2005 | SE | 24.11.2005 | DE | 25.11.2005 | PT | 24.01.2006 | HU | 25.02.2006 | IE | 20.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2005 | ||
EE | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
RO | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SK | 24.08.2005 | ||
TR | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
HU | 25.02.2006 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2005 | ||
EE | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
RO | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SK | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
HU | 25.02.2006 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
RO | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SK | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
HU | 25.02.2006 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SK | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
HU | 25.02.2006 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SK | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SK | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SK | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
DE | 25.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SK | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SI | 24.08.2005 | ||
BG | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB270470 (W & F WALKER LTD, et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 40 - line 47 * * page 2, line 40 - line 45 * * page 2, line 108 - line 114 ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]US1769409 (ARMSTRONG CHARLES L) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3972993 (KOBAYASHI HIDETOSHI, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 8 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9960848 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract*; page 9, line 25 - line 28 * * figures 2,3 * * page 10, line 1 - line 7 * |