Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
01.06.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.06.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
01.06.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.05.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
11.03.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.09.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
03.09.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
19.07.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |