EP1362658 - Machine for sawing panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCM Group S.p.A. Via Emilia 77 47900 Rimini / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states SCM GROUP S.p.A. Via Emilia 77 47900 Rimini / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spazzoli, Andrea Via Giovanni XXIII, 16 47814 Bellaria (RIMINI) / IT | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 03425266.8 | 30.04.2003 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | IT2002BO00290 | 14.05.2002 Original published format: IT BO20020290 | [2003/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362658 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362658 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23D47/02, B27B5/22, B23Q1/74, B23Q7/05, B27B27/04 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
B27B27/04 (EP);
B23D47/02 (EP);
B23Q1/74 (EP);
B23Q7/05 (EP);
B27B5/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/47] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Sägen von Platten | [2003/47] | English: | Machine for sawing panels | [2003/47] | French: | Machine pour scier des panneaux | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2005 | CH | 20.07.2005 | CY | 20.07.2005 | EE | 20.07.2005 | FI | 20.07.2005 | LI | 20.07.2005 | NL | 20.07.2005 | RO | 20.07.2005 | SI | 20.07.2005 | SK | 20.07.2005 | TR | 20.07.2005 | BG | 20.10.2005 | DK | 20.10.2005 | GR | 20.10.2005 | SE | 20.10.2005 | ES | 31.10.2005 | PT | 21.12.2005 | HU | 21.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/41] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
EE | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
RO | 20.07.2005 | ||
SI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SK | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
BG | 20.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
HU | 21.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
EE | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
SI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SK | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
BG | 20.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
HU | 21.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
EE | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
SI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SK | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
BG | 20.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
SI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SK | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
BG | 20.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/29] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
SI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SK | 20.07.2005 | ||
BG | 20.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
SI | 20.07.2005 | ||
BG | 20.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
SI | 20.07.2005 | ||
BG | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SI | 20.07.2005 | ||
BG | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US1346269 (ANDREWS SMITH GEORGE) [Y] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 73 - line 86 * * page 2, line 119 - line 129 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,9; | [A]DE1628865 (OTTO BECK KG WERKZEUG UND MASC) [A] 1,9,10 * page 10, paragraphs 2-4 * * figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [YA]US4852623 (RODRIGUES JOHN M [US]) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 19 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 5-7; | [PA]EP1205285 (LAZZARI SRL [IT]) [PA] 1,9,10 * column 3, line 11 - line 37 ** figures 2-4 * |