Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
18.10.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.07.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.07.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.07.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.07.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
05.11.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |