EP1491197 - Pharmaceutical composition comprising voacamine for the stimulation and modulation of the human immunologic system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bertelli Motta, Guiseppe Via del Molino, 6/b 10060 Scalenghe / IT | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertelli Motta, Giuseppe Via del Molino 6b 10060 Scalenghe / IT | 02 /
Rossi, Silvio Via Cossu 78 10040 Carignano / IT | 03 /
Stauffer, Eric Capo d'Arena 23 84040 Capriolo / IT | [2005/01] | Application number, filing date | 03425418.5 | 26.06.2003 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491197 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/551, A61K35/78, A61P37/04 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/551 (EP);
A61K36/24 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/24, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung enthaltend Voacamine für die Stimulierung und Modulierung des menschlichen Immunsystems | [2005/01] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition comprising voacamine for the stimulation and modulation of the human immunologic system | [2005/01] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique à base de voacamine pour la stimulation et modulation du système immunitaire humain | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2823204 (MAURICE-MARIE JANOT, et al) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 13; example 1 *; | [X]FR1212007 (GOBEY LAB) [X] 1-13 * page 2; example 1 *; | [X]FR1492463 (GEIGY AG J R) [X] 1-13 * page 2; example 1 *; | [X]WO9948501 (ROSSI SILVIO [IT], et al) [X] 1-13 * claims 1-13 *; | ITTO980335 [ ] (BERTELLI MOTTA GIUSEPPE [IT], et al); | [X] - BERTELLI MOTTA GIUSEPPE (IT) ET AL, EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, XP002272669 [X] 1-13 * abstract * | [X] - RAMANITRAHASIMBOLA D ET AL, "BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES OF THE PLANT-DERIVED BISINDOLE VOACAMINE WITH REFERENCE TO MALARIA", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, GB, (2001), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 0951-418X, pages 30 - 33, XP008013037 [X] 1-13 * page 1, columns 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1099-1573(200102)15:1<30::AID-PTR680>3.0.CO;2-T | [A] - TACHIBANA Y ET AL, "Mitogenic Activities in African Traditional Herbal Medicines.", PLANTA MED. (59, NO. 4, 354-58, 1993) 2 FIG. 6 TAB. 18 REF. CODEN: PLMEAA ISSN: 0032-0943, XP009025955 [A] 1-13 * page 1; table 2 * | [A] - SUFFREDINI I B ET AL, "In vitro anti-HIV and antitumor evaluation of Amazonian plants belonging to the Apocynaceae family", PHYTOMEDICINE (JENA), (200203), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 0944-7113, page 175, XP009025932 [A] 1-13 * page 175, column 1 * |