EP1512949 - Method and device for determining the hydraulic flow rate in a pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Askoll Holding S.r.l. Via Industria, 30 36031 Povolaro di Dueville (Vicenza) / IT | [2005/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marioni, Elio Via Molino, 6 36031 Dueville (Vicenza) / IT | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03425571.1 | 04.09.2003 | [2005/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512949 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512949 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/78, F04D15/00, G01D5/14 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01F1/78 (KR);
F04D15/00 (KR);
F04D15/0088 (EP,US);
F04D15/0094 (EP);
G01D5/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des hydraulischen Durchflusses in einer Pumpe | [2005/10] | English: | Method and device for determining the hydraulic flow rate in a pump | [2005/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détermination du débit hydraulique dans une pompe | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2007 | BE | 03.01.2007 | CH | 03.01.2007 | CY | 03.01.2007 | CZ | 03.01.2007 | EE | 03.01.2007 | FI | 03.01.2007 | LI | 03.01.2007 | NL | 03.01.2007 | RO | 03.01.2007 | SI | 03.01.2007 | SK | 03.01.2007 | SE | 03.04.2007 | BG | 04.04.2007 | GR | 04.04.2007 | PT | 04.06.2007 | HU | 04.07.2007 | IE | 04.09.2007 | LU | 04.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CY | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
IE | 04.09.2007 | ||
LU | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CY | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
IE | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
IE | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
IE | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
RO | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4781525 (HUBBARD LLOYD C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 39 *; | [A]DE4418721 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12* figure W *; | [X]EP0971212 (SULZER ELECTRONICS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * sentence 3 - sentence 5 * * page 4, line 23 - line 28 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 7 * * page 8, line 35 - page 9, line 21 * |