EP1400749 - Support for lamp holders, especially for halogen lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERDA s.r.l. Via U. Corsi n. 15 50141 Firenze / IT | [2004/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pini, Bellsarlo Via Ugo Corsi 27 50141 Firenze / IT | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via A. Gramsci, 42 50132 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via dei Rustici, 5 50122 Firenze FI / IT | ||
Former [2004/13] | Martini, Lazzaro Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5 50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 03425588.5 | 10.09.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | IT2002FI00089U | 19.09.2002 Original published format: IT fi20020089 U | [2004/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1400749 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1400749 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F21V19/00 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
F21V19/00 (EP);
F21V19/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halterung für eine Lampenfassung, insbesondere für Halogenlampen | [2004/13] | English: | Support for lamp holders, especially for halogen lamps | [2004/13] | French: | Support pour douille de lampe, notamment pour lampes halogènes | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2714922 (BROEKELMANN JAEGER & BUSSE) [X] 1-4,6 * page 10, line 14 - page 13, line 11 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE19624591 (MURJAHN KG VLM [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * column 2, line 51 - line 55 * * column 3, line 23 - line 26 * * column 4, line 17 - line 28 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE10019760 (PHOENIX LAMPS INDIA LTD [IN]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 8 - line 23 ** figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP1114964 (ETI ELEKTROELEMENT DD [SI]) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * * column 6, line 33 - line 45 * * column 7, line 9 - line 14 * * column 7, line 23 - line 27 * * column 7, line 33 - line 36 * * figures 1,4,6 *; | [X]EP1219889 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 18 - line 32 * * figures 1-5 * |