EP1518789 - Machine for applying partly adhesive straps to products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPL Packaging S.p.A. Via Fattori 4/6 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | [2007/11] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states KPL Packaging S.P.A. Via Fattori 4/6 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baldanza, Luca Via Pertini, 1 40033 Casalecchio Di Reno / IT | 02 /
Bertusi, Giuliano Via XXIX Settembre, 10 40036 Monzuno / IT | 03 /
Cassoli, Mirko Via Porrettene, 84 40037 Sasso Marconi / IT | [2005/35] |
Former [2005/13] | 01 /
Baldana, Luca Via Pertini, 1 40033 Casalecchio Di Reno / IT | ||
02 /
Bertusi, Giuliano Via XXIX Settembre, 10 40036 Monzuno / IT | |||
03 /
Cassoli, Mirko Via Porrettene, 84 40037 Sasso Marconi / IT | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Mannucci, Michele Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | ||
Former [2005/13] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03425622.2 | 26.09.2003 | [2005/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518789 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518789 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B61/14 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
B65B61/14 (EP,US);
B65B59/04 (EP,US);
B65B61/12 (EP,US);
Y10S493/926 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/51] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Maschine zum Anbringen von teilweise klebenden Streifen an Produkte | [2005/13] | English: | Machine for applying partly adhesive straps to products | [2005/13] | French: | Machine pour la pose de bandes partiellement adhésives sur des produits | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 04.10.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   13.10.2005 | 22.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.09.2007 | IT | 26.09.2007 | ES | 27.09.2007 | FR | 01.10.2007 | [2009/09] |
Former [2009/03] | GB | 26.09.2007 | |
IT | 26.09.2007 | ||
FR | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/49] | IT | 26.09.2007 | |
FR | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | IT | 26.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS6333238 (IBARAKI SEIKI KK) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-5 *[A] 7-10; | [X]FR2678238 (EKA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 35; figures 9,10 * |