EP1524772 - Method and system for phase recovery and decoding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Visalli, Giuseppe Via delle Mura, 44 98121 Messina / IT | 02 /
Pappalardo, Francesco Via Madonna della Scala, 10 95047 Paternò (Catania) / IT | 03 /
Avellone, Giuseppe Via Paisiello 31 90145 Palermo / IT | 04 /
Rimi, Francesco Via Mirrione 17 91011 Alcamo (Trapani) / IT | 05 /
Galluzzo, Agostino Piazza Paolo Borsellino 14 92020 Palma di Montechiaro (Agrigento) / IT | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03425662.8 | 13.10.2003 | [2005/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1524772 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1524772 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/25, H04L27/233 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
H04L1/0059 (EP,US);
H03M13/256 (EP,US);
H04L1/0054 (EP,US);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
H04L25/067 (EP,US);
H04L27/2272 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/02] |
Former [2005/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Phasenrückgewinnung und Dekodierung | [2005/16] | English: | Method and system for phase recovery and decoding | [2005/16] | French: | Méthode et système de recouvrement de phase et de décodage | [2005/16] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 27.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 20.06.2008 | [2009/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0317127 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-51* the whole document *; | [A]EP0369406 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-51 * the whole document *; | [A] - MACDONALD A J ET AL, "PLL synchronization for coded modulation", COMMUNICATIONS - RISING TO THE HEIGHTS. DENVER, JUNE 23 - 26, 1991, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19910623), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-0006-8, pages 1708 - 1712, XP010044226 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1991.162290 | [A] - MUTSUMU SERIZAWA ET AL, "PHASE-TRACKING VITERBI DEMODULATOR", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, SCRIPTA TECHNICA. NEW YORK, US, (1996), vol. 79, no. 1, ISSN 8756-6621, pages 82 - 96, XP000553793 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * |