EP1526083 - TAMPER EVIDENT CONTAINER CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abazia S.p.A. Via Collina 30 15024 Masio / IT | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Racioppa, Giovanni Via Collina 30 15024 Masio / IT | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L., Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03425675.0 | 20.10.2003 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1526083 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/10, B65D51/20 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
B65D47/103 (EP);
B65D51/20 (EP);
B65D2251/0015 (EP);
B65D2251/0093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/03] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ORIGINALITÄTSVERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2005/17] | English: | TAMPER EVIDENT CONTAINER CLOSURE | [2005/17] | French: | FERMETURE INVIOLABLE POUR UN RECIPIENT | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/37] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.12.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.12.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4815618 (GACH PETER P [US]) [X] 1,3-8,10-12,14 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 48; figures 1,3,5 * [Y] 2,9,13; | [YA]US5755360 (ELLIOTT JOHN [US]) [Y] 9 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 48; figure 2 * [A] 1-8,10-14; | [A]EP1266839 (PORTOLA PACKAGING LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14* figures 4,5,7 *; | [X]US2003010781 (ODET PHILLIPE [FR]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph 31 - page 3, paragraph 54; figures 4,5 *; | [YA]DE3844985 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,13 * column 4, line 17 - column 6, line 25; figures 5,7A * [A] 1,3-12,14 |