EP1529862 - Method for restarting a weaving loom after stopping and/or changing the warp chain position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promatech S.p.A. Via Case Sparse, 4 24020 Colzate (Bergamo) / IT | [2005/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casarotto, Giuseppe Via Brigata Lupi 6 24122 Bergamo / IT | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Faggioni, Carlo Maria, et al Fumero S.r.l. Pettenkoferstrasse 20/22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Faggioni, Carlo Maria, et al Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2005/19] | Faggioni, Carlo Maria, Dr. Ing., et al Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 03425726.1 | 10.11.2003 | [2005/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1529862 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529862 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D03D51/00 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
D03J1/007 (EP);
D03D51/002 (EP);
D03D51/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Wiederanlaufen einer Webmaschine nach einem Stillstand und/oder einer Änderung der Position der Kette | [2005/19] | English: | Method for restarting a weaving loom after stopping and/or changing the warp chain position | [2005/19] | French: | Procédé de redémarrage d'un métier à tisser après un arrêt et/ou un changement de position de la chaîne | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2007 | CY | 02.05.2007 | CZ | 02.05.2007 | DK | 02.05.2007 | EE | 02.05.2007 | FI | 02.05.2007 | NL | 02.05.2007 | RO | 02.05.2007 | SI | 02.05.2007 | SK | 02.05.2007 | BG | 02.08.2007 | SE | 02.08.2007 | GR | 03.08.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | HU | 03.11.2007 | GB | 10.11.2007 | LU | 10.11.2007 | IE | 12.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CY | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
GB | 10.11.2007 | ||
LU | 10.11.2007 | ||
IE | 12.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CY | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
GB | 10.11.2007 | ||
IE | 12.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
GB | 10.11.2007 | ||
IE | 12.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
GB | 10.11.2007 | ||
IE | 12.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
IE | 12.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 02.05.2007 | |
SE | 02.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0465555 ; | [A]DE486590 (VER SEIDENWEBEREIEN AG) [A] 1,2,4* the whole document *; | [X]US4582095 (KRONHOLM ROLF [SE]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [X]CH668997 (ZELLWEGER USTER AG) [X] 1,2,4 * page 3, column 1, line 53 - page 3, column 2, line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]US5520224 (DE JAGER GODERT [CH]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920617), vol. 016, no. 269, Database accession no. (C - 0952), & JP04065555 A 19920302 (TSUDAKOMA CORP) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * |