EP1551097 - Power conversion device with synchronous rectifier driving and voltage oscillation limitation during a discontinuous operating mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Librizzi, Fabrizio Via Oberdan, 9 95030 Gravina di Catania (Catania) / IT | 02 /
Macina, Francesco Corso San Vito, 85 95030 Mascalucia (Catania) / IT | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Ferrari, Barbara Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Ferrari, Barbara Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03425831.9 | 31.12.2003 | [2005/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551097 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M1/00 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
H02M1/081 (EP,US);
H02M3/33592 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/13] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stromrichteranordnung mit einer Ansteuerung für Synchrongleichrichter und einer Begrenzung von Spannungsschwingungen während des lückenden Betriebes | [2005/27] | English: | Power conversion device with synchronous rectifier driving and voltage oscillation limitation during a discontinuous operating mode | [2005/27] | French: | Dispositif de conversion de puissance avec une commande à redresseur synchrone et une limitation des oscillations de tension lors d'un mode de fonctionnement discontinu | [2005/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 29.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000092824 ; | [A]JPH11187651 ; | [DA]EP1148624 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [DA] 1-13 * figures 6,8 * * paragraphs [0042] - [0044] *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000092824 A 20000331 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [XA] - LIBRIZZI F, "MIT KOEPFCHEN SCHALTEN NEUE SMART-DRIVER-FAMILIE VEREINFACHT DIE IMPLEMENTIERUNG VON SYNCHRONGLEICHRICHTERN FUER ISOLIERTE SCHALTNETZTEILE", ELEKTRONIK, FRANZIS VERLAG GMBH. MUNCHEN, DE, (20020611), vol. 51, no. 12, ISSN 0013-5658, pages 44 - 49, XP001168119 [X] 13 * abstract * * pages 47,48 * * figures 8-10 * [A] 1-12 | [A] - LIBRIZZI F ET AL, "STSR3 SIMPLIFIES IMPLEMENTATION OF SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFIER IN FLYBACK CONVERTER", APPLICATION NOTE ST MICROELECTRONICS, XX, XX, (200301), pages 1 - 22, XP002287536 [A] 1-13 * figures 1,4,12 * * pages 2,4,7,10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11187651 A 19990709 (FUJI ELELCTROCHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 2 * | Examination | EP0618666 | US2003147265 |