EP1350861 - Process for fabrication and regeneration of sputtering targets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alloys for Technical Applications S.A. Rue du Chêne, 42A 5590 Achene-Ciney / BE | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clavareau, Guy Manoir de Froidfontaine, 54 Barsy 5370 Havelange / BE | 02 /
Lefevre, Patrick Avenue de la Chasse Royale, 5 7022 Hyon / BE | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Cauchie, Daniel Office Parette (Fred Maes) Avenue Gabrielle Petit 2 7940 Brugelette / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Cauchie, Daniel Office Parette (Fred Maes), Avenue Gabrielle Petit 2 7940 Brugelette / BE | Application number, filing date | 03447062.5 | 26.03.2003 | [2003/41] | Priority number, date | BE20020000230 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: BE 200200230 | [2003/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350861 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, C23C14/34 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
C23C14/3414 (EP,US);
C23C4/131 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung und Regeneration von Sputtertargets | [2003/41] | English: | Process for fabrication and regeneration of sputtering targets | [2003/41] | French: | Procédé de fabrication et de recharge de cibles pour pulverisation cathodique | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP01052051 ; | [YA]JPS62161945 ; | [A]DE3318828 (INTERPANE ENTW & BERATUNGSGES [DE]) [A] 1-19* claim 1 *; | [XY]WO9800574 (METALPLUS PROPRIETARY LIMITED [ZA], et al) [X] 10 * page 4, line 15 - page 7, line 19 * [Y] 1,5-7,11; | [XA]WO9902288 (JOHNSON MATTHEY ELECT INC [US]) [X] 12-19 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 16; claim 25 * [A] 1-11; | [XA]WO0038862 (ULTRACLAD CORP [US]) [X] 12-15,17-19 * page 4, line 18 - line 29 * [A] 1-11,16; | [Y] - "PROCESS FOR FABRICATING SPUTTERING TARGETS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (19890401), no. 300, ISSN 0374-4353, page 286, XP000068513 [Y] 1,5-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890606), vol. 013, no. 241, Database accession no. (C - 604), & JP01052051 A 19890228 (DAINIPPON TORYO CO LTD) [Y] 8 * abstract * | [YA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 34, Database accession no. 1987-238910, XP002221639 & JPS62161945 A 19870717 (OSAKA FUJI KOGYO KK) [Y] 11 * abstract * [A] 1-10,12-19 |