EP1477409 - Refoldable container and blank therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Genechten Biermans Raadsherenstraat 2 2300 Turnhout / BE | [2004/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berthold, Claude Slegherslaan 84 1200 Brussel / BE | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2004/47] | Luys, Marie-José, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Holidaystraat 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 03447108.6 | 13.05.2003 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477409 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/24 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
B65D5/247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] |
Former [2005/31] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wieder zusammenfaltbare Verpackung und Zuschnitt hierfür | [2004/47] | English: | Refoldable container and blank therefore | [2004/47] | French: | Emballage repliable et flan pour ce dernier | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 03.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.06.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 23.06.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.06.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.2005 | 31.05.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1046945 (BAUER FRED W [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * figure 6 *; | [A]US1369634 (JACK DON) [A] 1,11 * figure 3 *; | [DA]GB530989 (JOHN RALPH SIMMONS, et al) [DA] 1,11 * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2630263 (RINGLER WILLIAM A) [A] 1,11 * figures 12,13 *; | [A]US3054550 (COMSTOCK ALFRED E) [A] 1,11* figures 11-15 *; | [A]US3289914 (FERDINAND LANGE-WIEHE) [A] 1,11 * figures 16-18 * |