EP1400186 - Sunshade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xie, Jianyong Shui Yun Tang Village, Cheng Dong Developing Zone Linhai Zhejiang / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Xie, Jianyong Shui Yun Tang Village, Cheng Dong Developing Zone Linhai, Zhejiang / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Fengming Shui Yun Tang Village Cheng Dong Developing Zone Linhai, Zhejiang / CN | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Intellectual Property House, Brussels Airport Business Park Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 03447214.2 | 19.08.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | CN2002260089U | 19.09.2002 Original published format: CN 02260089 U | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1400186 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A45B25/14 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
A45B25/14 (EP,US);
A45B23/00 (EP,US);
A45B19/04 (EP,US);
A45B2023/0012 (EP,US);
A45B2023/0037 (EP,US);
A45B2023/0062 (EP,US);
A45B2025/146 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/51] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sonnenschirm | [2004/13] | English: | Sunshade | [2004/13] | French: | Parasol | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 27.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0392989 (GABBIANO S R L [IT]) [A] 2,3* column 3, lines 16-29 *; | [A]WO0112009 (GOLDWITZ TRACY [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 3 - page 10, line 2 *; | [A]US6321763 (MA JOEN SHEN [TW]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 5, line 35 *; | [A]US2002083969 (TUNG PAI [TW]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * |