Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1400186
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.06.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
04.03.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.09.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
26.05.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.04.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.04.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
23.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
14.01.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.12.2004 |
First examination report |
|
28.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.10.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
27.10.2004 |
Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.10.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.09.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] |
06.02.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |