Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6953043 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2005 | B2 | US2004055628 | 25.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN02260089 | 19.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1400186 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN02260089 | 19.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN2576065Y | 01.10.2003 | Y | Priority number | Date | CN02260089 | 19.09.2002 |