EP1365074 - Apparatus for hydraulically coupling a loading implement to a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauer, Franz Nr.67 3125 Statzendorf / AT | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Atzwanger, Richard Patentanwalt Nothartgasse 16 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Atzwanger, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Strasse 1c 1060 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03450083.5 | 10.04.2003 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | AT20020000787 | 23.05.2002 Original published format: AT 7872002 | [2003/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1365074 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1365074 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/627 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
E02F3/433 (EP);
E02F3/3654 (EP);
E02F3/6273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur hydraulischen Kupplung von einer Ladeeinrichtung an einem Tragfahrzeug | [2003/48] | English: | Apparatus for hydraulically coupling a loading implement to a vehicle | [2003/48] | French: | Dispositif pour accoupler hydrauliquement un outil de chargement et un véhicule | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 15.12.2004 | CZ | 15.12.2004 | EE | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | FR | 15.12.2004 | GB | 15.12.2004 | IE | 15.12.2004 | IT | 15.12.2004 | NL | 15.12.2004 | RO | 15.12.2004 | SI | 15.12.2004 | SK | 15.12.2004 | TR | 15.12.2004 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | HU | 16.03.2005 | ES | 26.03.2005 | AT | 10.04.2005 | CY | 10.04.2005 | LU | 10.04.2005 | BE | 30.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/41] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
IT | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
RO | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
AT | 10.04.2005 | ||
CY | 10.04.2005 | ||
LU | 10.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/40] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
IT | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
AT | 10.04.2005 | ||
CY | 10.04.2005 | ||
LU | 10.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
AT | 10.04.2005 | ||
CY | 10.04.2005 | ||
LU | 10.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
AT | 10.04.2005 | ||
CY | 10.04.2005 | ||
LU | 10.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
AT | 10.04.2005 | ||
CY | 10.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
AT | 10.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
AT | 10.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
AT | 10.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
HU | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SI | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0849253 ; | [A]US4738463 (POORE BERNARD B [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]FR2684120 (EMILY ETS [FR]) [A] 1-12 * page 5 - page 7; figure - *; | [A]FR2687115 (EMILY SA ETS [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2745043 (ALO MASKINER AB [SE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08049253 A 19960220 (SANYO KIKI KK) [A] * abstract * |