EP1411285 - Piezoelectric valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoerbiger Automatisierungstechnik Holding GmbH Südliche Römerstrasse 15 86972 Altenstadt / DE | For all designated states Honeywell GmbH Phileas Foggstraat 7 7821 AJ Emmen / NL | [2005/52] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Hoerbiger Automatisierungstechnik Holding GmbH Südliche Römerstrasse 15 86972 Altenstadt / DE | ||
For all designated states Honeywell Gmbh Phileas Foggstraat 7 7821 AJ Emmen / NL | |||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states HYGRAMA AG Baarerstrasse 18 6304 Zug / CH | ||
For all designated states Honeywell Gmbh Phileas Foggstraat 7 7821 AJ Emmen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strasser, Günther Oberfeldweg 11 82409 Wildsteig / DE | 02 /
Vollmer, Josef Bayernstrasse 6 86975 Bernbeuren / DE | 03 /
Schaible, Jochen Rosenstrasse 20 72213 Altensteig / DE | [2005/51] |
Former [2004/17] | 01 /
Strasser, Günther Oberfeldweg 11 82409 Wildsteig / DE | ||
02 /
Dr. Vollmer, Josef Bayernstrasse 6 86975 Bernbeuren / DE | |||
03 /
Dr. Schaible, Jochen Rosenstrasse 20 72213 Altensteig / DE | Representative(s) | Laminger, Norbert, et al Pinter, Laminger & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Laminger, Norbert, et al Pinter, Laminger & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2004/17] | Laminger, Norbert, et al Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03450221.1 | 01.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | AT20020001556 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: AT 15562002 | [2004/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1411285 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1411285 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/00 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
F16K31/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/02] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Piezoelektrisches Ventil | [2004/17] | English: | Piezoelectric valve | [2004/17] | French: | Soupape piézo-électrique | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19547149 (MARCO SYSTEMANALYSE ENTW [DE]) [A] 1,4* figure 3; claim 10 *; | [AD]DE19720849 (FESTO KG [DE]) [AD] 1,4 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0922893 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0073]; figure - * | by applicant | DE19720849 |